AL HB130 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Collins motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-06 - Collins motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
United Way and united appeal funds, tax exemption from all taxes, certain existing funds deemed included, Tax Exemption Reform Act of 2017, Sec. 40-9-12 am'd.
Title
United Way and united appeal funds, tax exemption from all taxes, certain existing funds deemed included, Tax Exemption Reform Act of 2017, Sec. 40-9-12 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | House | Collins motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote |
2017-04-06 | House | Collins motion to Substitute SB181 for HB130 a Companion Bill adopted Voice Vote |
2017-04-06 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 440 |
2017-04-06 | House | Collins Amendment Offered |
2017-04-06 | House | Third Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2017-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |