AL HB130 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hunting, disabled persons hunting license established, continuously valid as long as disability continues, issuance fee, Sec. 9-11-54 am'd.
Title
Hunting, disabled persons hunting license established, continuously valid as long as disability continues, issuance fee, Sec. 9-11-54 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | House | Engrossed |
2015-06-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:16 p.m. on June 4, 2015. |
2015-06-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-455. |
2015-06-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-06-04 | House | Enrolled |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-06-04 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1469 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |
2015-05-19 | House | Engrossed |
2015-05-19 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 853 |
2015-05-19 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 852 |
2015-05-19 | House | Agriculture and Forestry first Substitute Offered |
2015-05-19 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2015-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry |