AL HB13 | 2012 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - Delivered to Governor at 2:05 a. m. on May 24, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Use taxes, remote use taxes collected, proceeds redistributed to State General Fund, and various entities, Secs. 40-23-60, 40-23-85, 40-23-174 am'd.; Sec. 40-23-150 repealed

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Use taxes, remote use taxes collected, proceeds redistributed to State General Fund, and various entities, Secs. 40-23-60, 40-23-85, 40-23-174 am'd.; Sec. 40-23-150 repealed

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-11-07 - Senate - Orr motion to Table (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - Senate - Rules Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - House - Oden intended to cote "Yea" (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-24 Delivered to Governor at 2:05 a. m. on May 24, 2012.
2012-05-24 Assigned Act No. 2012-599.
2012-05-24 Clerk of the House Certification
2012-05-24 Signature Requested
2012-05-24 Enrolled
2012-05-24 Passed Second House
2012-05-24 Orr motion to Table adopted Roll Call 30
2012-05-24 Smitherman motion to Reconsider
2012-05-24 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 29
2012-05-24 Rules Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 28.
2012-05-24 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-23 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-05-22 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2012-05-21 Engrossed
2012-05-21 Oden intended to cote "Yea"
2012-05-21 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 15
2012-05-21 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 14
2012-05-21 Love Amendment Offered
2012-05-21 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 13
2012-05-21 Ways and Means Education Amendment Offered
2012-05-21 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-18 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2012-05-17 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB13
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB13-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452222&VOTE=13&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452225&VOTE=14&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452226&VOTE=15&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452234&VOTE=18&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452733&VOTE=28&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452738&VOTE=29&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=452742&VOTE=30&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1060&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback