AL HB129 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Delivered to Governor at 3:21 p.m. on April 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Delivered to Governor at 3:21 p.m. on April 23, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Madison, ad valorem tax, additional levy authorized for education, referendum
Title
Madison, ad valorem tax, additional levy authorized for education, referendum
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Ball [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 69 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2019-03-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 69 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:21 p.m. on April 23, 2019. |
2019-04-23 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-88. |
2019-04-23 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-04-18 | House | Enrolled |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 293 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Legislation |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Madison County Legislation |
2019-03-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 22 |
2019-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-03-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |