AL HB129 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Forwarded to Governor on April 1, 2014 at 5:15 p.m. on April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Private schools, colleges, universities, sale of tangible property, including lunches sold within school buildings continue to be exempt from state and local sales and use taxes, Secs. 40-23-4, 40-23-62 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Private schools, colleges, universities, sale of tangible property, including lunches sold within school buildings continue to be exempt from state and local sales and use taxes, Secs. 40-23-4, 40-23-62 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 59) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-01HouseForwarded to Governor on April 1, 2014 at 5:15 p.m. on April 1, 2014.
2014-04-01HouseAssigned Act No. 2014-325.
2014-04-01HouseClerk of the House Certification
2014-04-01HouseEnrolled
2014-04-01SenateSignature Requested
2014-04-01HousePassed Second House
2014-04-01SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1075
2014-04-01SenateThird Reading Passed
2014-02-12SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-02-04SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2014-01-30HouseCosponsors intended to be added
2014-01-30HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 84
2014-01-30HouseThird Reading Passed
2014-01-15HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2014-01-14HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback