AL HB129 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-23 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
Pending: Senate Local Legislation No. 1 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-23 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
Pending: Senate Local Legislation No. 1 Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fort Payne, alcoholic beverages, draft or keg beer or malt beverages, sale authorized, city council to regulate
Title
Fort Payne, alcoholic beverages, draft or keg beer or malt beverages, sale authorized, city council to regulate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 45 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2012-02-21 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 59 | |
2012-02-21 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-16 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |