AL HB128 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, overtaking and passing bicycles, must maintain safe distance of at least three feet from bicycle, definition of safe distance, Sec. 32-5A-82 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicles, overtaking and passing bicycles, must maintain safe distance of at least three feet from bicycle, definition of safe distance, Sec. 32-5A-82 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | House | Indefinitely Postponed |
2015-05-19 | House | Time to debate expired |
2015-05-19 | House | Third Reading Placed on the Calendar |
2015-04-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |