AL HB127 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-8)
Status: Enrolled on June 2 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-09 - Conference Committee on HB127 2011RS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 2 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-09 - Conference Committee on HB127 2011RS first Substitute Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Coal, excise and privilege tax, termination date extended, tax proceeds further distributed, Sec. 40-13-6, 40-13-8 am'd. (2011-20623)
Title
Coal, excise and privilege tax, termination date extended, tax proceeds further distributed, Sec. 40-13-6, 40-13-8 am'd. (2011-20623)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-09 - House - Roberts motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 49 N: 26 NV: 5 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - Motion to Suspend Rules (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - Hammon motion to Previous Question (Y: 58 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Bedford motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Roberts motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Roberts motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Orr Amendment Reed motion to Table (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Bussman Amendment (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities Amendment No. 3 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities Amendment No. 2 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - Roberts motion to Table (Y: 50 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 65 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - Motion to Suspend Rules (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - Hammon motion to Previous Question (Y: 58 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Bedford motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Roberts motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - House - Roberts motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Orr Amendment Reed motion to Table (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Bussman Amendment (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities Amendment No. 3 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities Amendment No. 2 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-05-31 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - Roberts motion to Table (Y: 50 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 65 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | Conference Committee on HB127 2011RS first Substitute Offered | |
2011-06-09 | Roberts motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1200 | |
2011-06-09 | Motion to Suspend Rules lost Roll Call 1199 | |
2011-06-09 | Hammon motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 1198 | |
2011-06-09 | Executive Amendment Offered | |
2011-06-09 | Delivered to Governor at 11:45 p.m. on June 2, 2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Concurred in Conference Report | |
2011-06-02 | Bedford motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1042 | |
2011-06-02 | Conference Report Concurrence Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Roberts motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1144 | |
2011-06-02 | Conference Report | |
2011-06-02 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-06-02 | Marsh motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 1009 P&PO appoints Reed, Allen and Bedford | |
2011-06-02 | Conference Committee Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Roberts motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 1084 House appoints Roberts, Harper and Canfield | |
2011-06-02 | Concurrence Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 883 | |
2011-06-02 | Orr Amendment Reed motion to Table adopted Roll Call 882. | |
2011-06-02 | Orr Amendment Offered. | |
2011-06-02 | Bussman Amendment adopted Roll Call 881. | |
2011-06-02 | Bussman Amendment Offered. | |
2011-06-02 | Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities Amendment No. 3 adopted Roll Call 880. | |
2011-06-02 | Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities Amendment No. 2 adopted Roll Call 879. | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-31 | Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities Amendment No. 3 Offered. | |
2011-05-31 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2011-05-31 | Marsh request to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted. | |
2011-05-31 | Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities Amendment No. 2 Offered.. | |
2011-05-31 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 837 | |
2011-05-31 | Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities first Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-31 | Marsh motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-05-31 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 3 amendments | |
2011-05-05 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities | |
2011-05-04 | Engrossed | |
2011-05-04 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 629 | |
2011-05-04 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 628 | |
2011-05-04 | Payne Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-04 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-04 | Roberts motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-05-04 | Roberts motion to Table adopted Roll Call 626 | |
2011-05-04 | Millican Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-04 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 625 | |
2011-05-04 | Commerce and Small Business first Substitute Offered | |
2011-05-04 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2011-04-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2011-03-03 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |