AL HB127 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-19 - Pending third reading on day 16 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-19 - Pending third reading on day 16 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Trucks, weight limit for vehicles equipped with a functioning auxiliary power or idle reduction technology increased, Sec. 32-9-20 am'd.
Title
Trucks, weight limit for vehicles equipped with a functioning auxiliary power or idle reduction technology increased, Sec. 32-9-20 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-19 | Pending third reading on day 16 Favorable from Judiciary | |
2010-01-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2010-02-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-19 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 33 | |
2010-01-19 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-01-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce |