AL HB126 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Delivered to Governor at 6:30 p. m. on May 10, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-10 - Delivered to Governor at 6:30 p. m. on May 10, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance, Unclaimed Life Insurance Benefits Act, death master file, notification to State Treasurer, submit unclaimed benefits or unclaimed retained asset account plus interest to State Treasurer
Title
Insurance, Unclaimed Life Insurance Benefits Act, death master file, notification to State Treasurer, submit unclaimed benefits or unclaimed retained asset account plus interest to State Treasurer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | Delivered to Governor at 6:30 p. m. on May 10, 2012. | |
2012-05-10 | Assigned Act No. 2012-424. | |
2012-05-10 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-10 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-10 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-10 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-10 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1353 | |
2012-05-10 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-10 | Blackwell motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-05-10 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2012-04-26 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-17 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance | |
2012-04-17 | Engrossed | |
2012-04-17 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 874 | |
2012-04-17 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 873 | |
2012-04-17 | Insurance Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-17 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 872 | |
2012-04-17 | Insurance first Substitute Offered | |
2012-04-17 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance |