AL HB124 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 8:03 p.m. on May 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

County superintendents of education, requirement to maintain office at co. seat deleted, Sec. 16-9-24 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County superintendents of education, requirement to maintain office at co. seat deleted, Sec. 16-9-24 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-04 - House - Collins motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 101 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 71 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - Collins motion to Table (Y: 47 N: 25 NV: 9 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04HouseDelivered to Governor at 8:03 p.m. on May 4, 2016.
2016-05-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2016-347.
2016-05-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2016-05-04SenateSignature Requested
2016-05-04HouseEnrolled
2016-05-04SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2016-05-04HouseCollins motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 861
2016-05-04HouseConcurrence Requested
2016-05-04SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 960
2016-05-04SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 959
2016-05-04SenateOrr Amendment Offered
2016-05-04SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-05-03SenateOrr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2016-05-03SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2016-04-13SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-03-15SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs
2016-03-08HouseEngrossed
2016-03-08HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 268
2016-03-08HouseCollins motion to Table adopted Roll Call 267
2016-03-08HouseWadsworth Amendment Offered
2016-03-08HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 266
2016-03-08HouseEducation Policy Amendment Offered
2016-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-02-24HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2016-02-03HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB124
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2016RS/PrintFiles/HB124-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2016RS/PrintFiles/HB124-eng.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=539416&VOTE=266&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=539450&VOTE=267&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=539451&VOTE=268&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=551805&VOTE=959&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=551806&VOTE=960&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=552135&VOTE=861&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback