AL HB123 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 9:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 9:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Higher Education, colleges and universities and postsecondary education, institutions authorized to charge resident tuition for nonresident distance learning, Secs. 16-64-2, 16-64-4 am'd.
Title
Higher Education, colleges and universities and postsecondary education, institutions authorized to charge resident tuition for nonresident distance learning, Secs. 16-64-2, 16-64-4 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. James Ison [R] | Rep. Chad Fincher [R] | Sen. Jim McClendon [R] | Rep. Mac McCutcheon [R] |
Sen. David Sessions [R] | Rep. Alan Baker [R] | Rep. Randy Davis [R] | Rep. Steve McMillan [R] |
Rep. Mary Moore [D] | Rep. Jim Barton [R] | Rep. Dan Williams [R] | Rep. Lynn Greer [R] |
Rep. Roderick Scott [D] | Rep. Mike Hubbard [R] | Rep. Jay Love [R] | Rep. Mary McClurkin [R] |
Rep. Victor Gaston [R] | Rep. Ed Henry [R] | Rep. Elaine Beech [D] | Rep. Terri Collins [R] |
Rep. Becky Nordgren [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-331. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1086 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education |
2013-04-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 359 |
2013-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |