AL HB122 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on May 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriations, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year ending September 30, 2016, from Education Trust Fund to the Department of Labor and to the Department of Archives and History

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year ending September 30, 2016, from Education Trust Fund to the Department of Labor and to the Department of Archives and History

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-03 - House - Poole motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 78 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - Poole motion to Table (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 81 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04HouseDelivered to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on May 4, 2016.
2016-05-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2016-346.
2016-05-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2016-05-04SenateSignature Requested
2016-05-03HouseEnrolled
2016-05-03SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2016-05-03HousePoole motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 823
2016-05-03HouseConcurrence Requested
2016-05-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 918
2016-05-03SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 917
2016-05-03SenateOrr Amendment Offered
2016-05-03SenateOrr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2016-05-03SenateFinance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered
2016-05-03SenateOrr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2016-05-03SenateFinance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered
2016-05-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-04-13SenateOrr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2016-04-13SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2016-04-12SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2016-03-23SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2016-03-08HouseEngrossed
2016-03-08HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 238
2016-03-08HousePoole motion to Table adopted Roll Call 237
2016-03-08HouseHenry Amendment Offered
2016-03-08HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 236
2016-03-08HouseWays and Means Education first Substitute Offered
2016-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-03-03HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2016-02-03HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB122
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2016RS/PrintFiles/HB122-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=539258&VOTE=236&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=539287&VOTE=237&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=539288&VOTE=238&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=551220&VOTE=917&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=551224&VOTE=918&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=551325&VOTE=823&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1065&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback