AL HB122 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 11:42 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 11:42 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State Parks, active or retired member of Armed Forces, free admission on state or federal holidays.
Title
State Parks, active or retired member of Armed Forces, free admission on state or federal holidays.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Delivered to Governor at 11:42 p. m. on May 16, 2012. | |
2012-05-16 | Assigned Act No. 2012-508. | |
2012-05-16 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-16 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-16 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-16 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1520 | |
2012-05-16 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-15 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs | |
2012-03-08 | Engrossed | |
2012-03-08 | Cosponsors Added | |
2012-03-08 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 277 | |
2012-03-08 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 276 | |
2012-03-08 | Military and Veterans Affairs Amendment Offered | |
2012-03-08 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-16 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans Affairs |