AL HB121 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - Garrett motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-09 - Garrett motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Counties and municipalities, investment of certain funds in commercial paper and banker's acceptances, authorized under certain conditions, Sec. 11-81-21 am'd.
Title
Counties and municipalities, investment of certain funds in commercial paper and banker's acceptances, authorized under certain conditions, Sec. 11-81-21 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - HBIR: Garrett motion to Adopt Roll Call 534 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Garrett motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote |
2022-03-09 | House | Garrett motion to SB178 Substitute FOR HB121 a Companion Bill adopted Voice Vote |
2022-03-09 | House | Third Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2022-02-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-13 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |
Same As/Similar To
SB178 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - Assigned Act No. 2022-146.