AL HB121 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-03 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eminent domain, prohibited for purpose of acquiring mortgages or deeds of trust, Secs. 11-47-170, 11-80-1, 18-1B-2 am'd.
Title
Eminent domain, prohibited for purpose of acquiring mortgages or deeds of trust, Secs. 11-47-170, 11-80-1, 18-1B-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Lee [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | House | Indefinitely Postponed |
2015-04-07 | House | Lee motion to Substitute SB83 for HB121 adopted voice vote |
2015-04-07 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 281 |
2015-04-07 | House | State Government Amendment Offered |
2015-04-07 | House | Third Reading Placed on the Calendar |
2015-03-19 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-03-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |