AL HB121 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Unemployment compensation, benefits for active duty military dependent spouses who quit work in order to relocate due to spouse's change of station orders, activation orders, or unit deployment orders, authorized, Sec. 25-4-78 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unemployment compensation, benefits for active duty military dependent spouses who quit work in order to relocate due to spouse's change of station orders, activation orders, or unit deployment orders, authorized, Sec. 25-4-78 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
2012-05-16 Assigned Act No. 2012-507.
2012-05-16 Signature Requested
2012-05-16 Enrolled
2012-05-16 Passed Second House
2012-05-16 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1542
2012-05-16 Third Reading Passed
2012-03-22 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-03-15 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
2012-03-14 Engrossed
2012-03-14 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 305
2012-03-14 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 304
2012-03-14 Wren Amendment Offered
2012-03-14 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-16 Clerk of the House Certification
2012-02-16 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-02-07 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB121
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB121-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB121-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB121-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=430584&VOTE=304&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=430586&VOTE=305&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=450782&VOTE=1542&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback