AL HB120 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Delivered to Governor at 10:50 a. m. on May 3, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Delivered to Governor at 10:50 a. m. on May 3, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Homestead exemptions, process for claiming an exemption from ad valorem taxes due to age or disability clarifed, income eligibility increased, uniform procedure for applying for the exemption, Department of Revenue establish rules and procedures, Sec. 40-9-19, 40-9-21 am'd (2012-20073)
Title
Homestead exemptions, process for claiming an exemption from ad valorem taxes due to age or disability clarifed, income eligibility increased, uniform procedure for applying for the exemption, Department of Revenue establish rules and procedures, Sec. 40-9-19, 40-9-21 am'd (2012-20073)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Delivered to Governor at 10:50 a. m. on May 3, 2012. | |
2012-05-03 | Assigned Act No. 2012-313. | |
2012-05-03 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-03 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-03 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 917 | |
2012-05-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund | |
2012-02-28 | Engrossed | |
2012-02-28 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 168 | |
2012-02-28 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 167 | |
2012-02-28 | County and Municipal Government first Substitute Offered | |
2012-02-28 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-16 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |