AL HB12 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Governor at 4:16 p.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Governor at 4:16 p.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Physicians and osteopaths, state licensing requirements waived for athletic team physicians traveling into state for sporting event
Title
Physicians and osteopaths, state licensing requirements waived for athletic team physicians traveling into state for sporting event
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Ford [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:16 p.m. on June 4, 2015. |
2015-06-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-451. |
2015-06-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-06-04 | House | Enrolled |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-06-04 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1452 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-03-19 | House | Engrossed |
2015-03-19 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 157 |
2015-03-19 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 156 |
2015-03-19 | House | Health Amendment Offered |
2015-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-03-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |