AL HB119 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Attorneys, encouraging litigation, criminal penalties increased, Secs. 34-3-24, 34-3-35 am'd.
Title
Attorneys, encouraging litigation, criminal penalties increased, Secs. 34-3-24, 34-3-35 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Fridy [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Further Consideration |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Orr motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-27 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 523 |
2018-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |