AL HB119 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-31 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-31 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, law enforcement officer authorized to issue citation if reasonable suspicion that driver was driving a motor vehicle without a proper license, request to see driver's license authorized under certain conditions, Sec. 32-6-9 am'd. (2011-20872)
Title
Motor vehicles, law enforcement officer authorized to issue citation if reasonable suspicion that driver was driving a motor vehicle without a proper license, request to see driver's license authorized under certain conditions, Sec. 32-6-9 am'd. (2011-20872)
Sponsors
Rep. Terri Collins [R] | Rep. Lynn Greer [R] | Rep. Wayne Johnson [R] | Rep. Paul Lee [R] |
Rep. Kerry Rich [R] | Rep. William Roberts [R] | Rep. Harry Shiver [R] | Rep. Dan Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Rich motion to Table (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - House - Rich motion to Table (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-31 | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Governmental Affairs | |
2011-05-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs | |
2011-05-24 | Engrossed | |
2011-05-24 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 842 | |
2011-05-24 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 841 | |
2011-05-24 | Rich first Substitute Offered | |
2011-05-24 | Rich motion to Table adopted Roll Call 840 | |
2011-05-24 | Public Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-24 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2011-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |