AL HB118 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adoption, to allow for post-adoption agreements for contact between adopted child and biologial relatives, Caleb's law, Sec. 26-10A-30 am'd.
Title
Adoption, to allow for post-adoption agreements for contact between adopted child and biologial relatives, Caleb's law, Sec. 26-10A-30 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 85 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2020-03-03 | House | Engrossed |
2020-03-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 182 |
2020-03-03 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 181 |
2020-03-03 | House | Judiciary first Substitute Offered |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2020-02-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |