AL HB118 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Delivered to Governor at 3:16 p.m. on april 16, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Delivered to Governor at 3:16 p.m. on april 16, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Massage Therapy, Board of, Sunset Law review, continued until October 1, 2023.
Title
Massage Therapy, Board of, Sunset Law review, continued until October 1, 2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:16 p.m. on april 16, 2019. |
2019-04-16 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-58. |
2019-04-16 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-04-11 | House | Enrolled |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 220 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2019-03-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 45 |
2019-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-03-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |