AL HB118 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Forwarded to Governor on March 28, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. on March 28, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Taxation, Alabama Gulf Coast Zoo, exempt from state, county, and municipal sales and use taxes, under certain conditions, Sec. 40-23-5 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation, Alabama Gulf Coast Zoo, exempt from state, county, and municipal sales and use taxes, under certain conditions, Sec. 40-23-5 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - House - McMillan motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseForwarded to Governor on March 28, 2018 at 4:30 p.m. on March 28, 2018.
2018-03-28HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-568.
2018-03-28HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-28HouseEnrolled
2018-03-28SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-28SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2018-03-28HouseMcMillan motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1080
2018-03-28HouseConcurrence Requested
2018-03-22SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1042
2018-03-22SenateMelson motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1041
2018-03-22SenateMelson Amendment Offered
2018-03-22SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-21SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-03-20SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2018-03-15HouseEngrossed
2018-03-15HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 841
2018-03-15HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 840
2018-03-15HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 839
2018-03-15HouseW&ME 2nd Amendment Offered
2018-03-15HouseW&ME 1st Amendment Offered
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-03-08HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB118&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB118-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB118-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192342-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192661-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=597199&VOTE=839&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=597200&VOTE=840&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=597205&VOTE=841&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=600009&VOTE=1041&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=600012&VOTE=1042&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=602176&VOTE=1080&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback