AL HB116 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Delivered to Governor at 2:19 p.m. on March 7, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Delivered to Governor at 2:19 p.m. on March 7, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterinary Medical Examiners, State Board of, Sunset Law review, continued until October 1, 2021.
Title
Veterinary Medical Examiners, State Board of, Sunset Law review, continued until October 1, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:19 p.m. on March 7, 2017. |
2017-03-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-72. |
2017-03-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 180 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2017-02-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 47 |
2017-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |