AL HB115 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Delivered to Governor at 3:16 p.m. on april 16, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Delivered to Governor at 3:16 p.m. on april 16, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Occupational Therapy, Alabama State Board of, Sunset Law review, continued until October 1, 2023.
Title
Occupational Therapy, Alabama State Board of, Sunset Law review, continued until October 1, 2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:16 p.m. on april 16, 2019. |
2019-04-16 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-55. |
2019-04-16 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-04-11 | House | Enrolled |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 214 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2019-03-21 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 39 |
2019-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-03-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |