AL HB115 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Delivered to Governor at 2:19 p.m. on March 7, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Delivered to Governor at 2:19 p.m. on March 7, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Optometry, Alabama Board of, Sunset Law review, continued until October 1, 2021.
Title
Optometry, Alabama Board of, Sunset Law review, continued until October 1, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:19 p.m. on March 7, 2017. |
2017-03-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-71. |
2017-03-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-03-02 | House | Enrolled |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 178 |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2017-02-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 45 |
2017-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |