AL HB115 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Forwarded to Governor on June 2, 2011 at 8:00 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Animals, fighting dogs, procedures for seizing, disposition process expedited, bond required under certain conditions, forfeiture of dog under certain conditions, Sec. 3-1-29 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Animals, fighting dogs, procedures for seizing, disposition process expedited, bond required under certain conditions, forfeiture of dog under certain conditions, Sec. 3-1-29 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-02 - House - Ison motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 85 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2011-04-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 81 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-02 Forwarded to Governor on June 2, 2011 at 8:00 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
2011-06-02 Assigned Act No. 2011-542 on 06/09/2011.
2011-06-02 Enrolled
2011-06-02 Clerk of the House Certification
2011-06-02 Signature Requested
2011-06-02 Concurred in Second House Amendment
2011-06-02 Ison motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1114
2011-06-02 Concurrence Requested
2011-06-02 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 989
2011-06-02 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 988
2011-06-02 Judiciary Amendment Offered
2011-06-02 Third Reading Passed
2011-05-05 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2011-04-27 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2011-04-21 Engrossed
2011-04-21 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 411
2011-04-21 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 410
2011-04-21 Agriculture and Forestry Amendment Offered
2011-04-21 Third Reading Passed
2011-03-09 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2011-03-01 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB115
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/HB115-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/HB115-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2011RS/PrintFiles/HB115-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=406457&VOTE=410&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=406466&VOTE=411&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=419954&VOTE=988&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=419955&VOTE=989&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=420109&VOTE=1114&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1058&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback