AL HB114 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fire protection sprinkler systems, State Fire Marshal authorized to issue permits for installation, Secs. 34-33-1, 34-33-2, 34-33-3, 34-33-4, 34-33-5 am'd.
Title
Fire protection sprinkler systems, State Fire Marshal authorized to issue permits for installation, Secs. 34-33-1, 34-33-2, 34-33-3, 34-33-4, 34-33-5 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. James Hanes [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2016-03-22 | House | Engrossed |
2016-03-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 358 |
2016-03-22 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 357 |
2016-03-22 | House | Public Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered |
2016-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2016-02-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |