AL HB113 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Delivered to Governor at 6:02 p. m. on May 3, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Delivered to Governor at 6:02 p. m. on May 3, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance Department, insurance producers licensure further provided for, require licensees notification of changes in addresses, Secs. 27-7-1, 27-7-5, 27-7-14.1, 27-7-17, 27-7-37, 27-8A-1, 27-8A-6 am'd; 27-7-4.4, 27-22A-1 to 27-22A-7, inclusive, added; 27-7-20, 27-7-21 repealed
Title
Insurance Department, insurance producers licensure further provided for, require licensees notification of changes in addresses, Secs. 27-7-1, 27-7-5, 27-7-14.1, 27-7-17, 27-7-37, 27-8A-1, 27-8A-6 am'd; 27-7-4.4, 27-22A-1 to 27-22A-7, inclusive, added; 27-7-20, 27-7-21 repealed
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Delivered to Governor at 6:02 p. m. on May 3, 2012. | |
2012-05-03 | Assigned Act No. 2012-312. | |
2012-05-03 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-03 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-03 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-03 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1049 | |
2012-05-03 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-15 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance | |
2012-02-28 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 178 | |
2012-02-28 | Engrossed | |
2012-02-28 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 177 | |
2012-02-28 | Wren 2nd Amendment Offered | |
2012-02-28 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 176 | |
2012-02-28 | Wren 1st Amendment Offered | |
2012-02-28 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-16 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance |