AL HB110 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to the Board of Physical Therapy; to amend Sections 34-24-191, 34-24-193, 34-24-194, 34-24-196, 34-24-210, 34-24-210.1, 34-24-211, 34-24-212, 34-24-213, 34-24-214, and 34-24-217, Code of Alabama 1975; to give the board authority over certain physical therapy professionals licensed in other states.
Title
Relating to the Board of Physical Therapy; to amend Sections 34-24-191, 34-24-193, 34-24-194, 34-24-196, 34-24-210, 34-24-210.1, 34-24-211, 34-24-212, 34-24-213, 34-24-214, and 34-24-217, Code of Alabama 1975; to give the board authority over certain physical therapy professionals licensed in other states.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | House | Enacted |
2023-06-01 | House | Enrolled |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-06-01 | Senate | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate State Governmental Affairs |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate State Governmental Affairs |
2023-04-27 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-04-27 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-04-27 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-04-12 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-12 | House | Reported Favorably from House Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2023-03-21 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2023-03-21 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |