AL HB110 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Class 6 municipalities, weed abatement as nuisance, alternate procedures, alternate procedure liens under certain conditions
Title
Class 6 municipalities, weed abatement as nuisance, alternate procedures, alternate procedure liens under certain conditions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Governmental Affairs |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2014-02-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 141 |
2014-02-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |