AL HB11 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Delivered to Governor at 2:45 p.m. on May 22, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Delivered to Governor at 2:45 p.m. on May 22, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hospitals, require hospitals to bill an injured person's health insurance and only seek compensation from health insurance unless certain circumstances apply, clarifying hospital lien provisions, Secs. 35-11-370 to 35-11-375, inclusive, am'd.
Title
Hospitals, require hospitals to bill an injured person's health insurance and only seek compensation from health insurance unless certain circumstances apply, clarifying hospital lien provisions, Secs. 35-11-370 to 35-11-375, inclusive, am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Connie Rowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:45 p.m. on May 22, 2019. |
2019-05-22 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-273. |
2019-05-22 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-21 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 944 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |
2019-04-16 | House | Engrossed |
2019-04-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 207 |
2019-04-16 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 206 |
2019-04-16 | House | Insurance first Substitute Offered |
2019-04-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2019-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance |