AL HB11 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2016-336.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Assigned Act No. 2016-336.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Drivers' licenses, renewal period, extended to 6 months prior to expiration, Sec. 32-6-1 am'd
Title
Drivers' licenses, renewal period, extended to 6 months prior to expiration, Sec. 32-6-1 am'd
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Faust [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-336. |
2016-05-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:10 p.m. on May 4, 2016. |
2016-05-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-05-04 | House | Enrolled |
2016-05-04 | House | Passed Second House |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 976 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2016-02-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 75 |
2016-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-17 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |