AL HB109 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation General Fund Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Justices and judges, revise compensation received by retired justices and judges who are called to active duty, Secs. 12-18-10, 12-18-61 am'd.
Title
Justices and judges, revise compensation received by retired justices and judges who are called to active duty, Secs. 12-18-10, 12-18-61 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 35 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - HBIR: Hill motion to Adopt Roll Call 34 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - HBIR: Hill motion to Adopt Roll Call 34 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2021-02-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 35 |
2021-02-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 18 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
12 | 18 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |