AL HB109 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on May 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Health Savings Accounts, income tax deduction auth. for contributions to, Sec. 40-18-15.6 added.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Savings Accounts, income tax deduction auth. for contributions to, Sec. 40-18-15.6 added.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04HouseDelivered to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on May 4, 2016.
2016-05-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2016-345.
2016-05-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2016-05-03HouseEnrolled
2016-05-04SenateSignature Requested
2016-05-03HousePassed Second House
2016-05-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 923
2016-05-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-03-10SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-03-01SenateRereferred to F&TE
2016-02-25SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services
2016-02-25HouseFridy intended to vote Yea
2016-02-25HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 123
2016-02-25HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-02-11HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-02-03HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback