AL HB105 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on May 4, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Supplemental appropriation, SBI Cost of Evidence Fund to the Alabama Law Enforcement Agency for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2016.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supplemental appropriation, SBI Cost of Evidence Fund to the Alabama Law Enforcement Agency for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2016.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-03 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-04HouseDelivered to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on May 4, 2016.
2016-05-04HouseAssigned Act No. 2016-344.
2016-05-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2016-05-03HouseEnrolled
2016-05-04SenateSignature Requested
2016-05-03HousePassed Second House
2016-05-03SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 929
2016-05-03SenateThird Reading Passed
2016-04-07SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-03-22SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2016-03-15HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 308
2016-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed
2016-02-17HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2016-02-03HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback