AL HB103 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to public education employee sick leave; to amend Section 16-1-18.1, Code of Alabama 1975, to authorize the use of up to eight weeks of sick leave for attending to an ill child for whom a petition for adoption has been filed and for attending to an adopted child.
Title
Relating to public education employee sick leave; to amend Section 16-1-18.1, Code of Alabama 1975, to authorize the use of up to eight weeks of sick leave for attending to an ill child for whom a petition for adoption has been filed and for attending to an adopted child.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - House - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Adopt GN7066-1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Add Cosponsor (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Adopt 1GMTLZ-1 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Adopt SYS378-1 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Adopt GN7066-1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Add Cosponsor (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Adopt 1GMTLZ-1 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Adopt SYS378-1 (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | House | Enacted |
2023-05-25 | House | Enrolled |
2023-05-24 | House | Concur In and Adopt |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Adopt GN7066-1 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Amendment/Substitute by Senate Finance and Taxation Education GN7066-1 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2023-04-04 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-04-04 | House | Add Cosponsor |
2023-04-04 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-04-04 | House | Adopt 1GMTLZ-1 |
2023-04-04 | House | Adopt SYS378-1 |
2023-04-04 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-03-22 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported Favorably from House Children and Senior Advocacy |
2023-03-21 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Children and Senior Advocacy EP3AC2-1 |
2023-03-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Children and Senior Advocacy |
2023-03-07 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |