AL HB103 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Delivered to Governor at 4:45 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - Delivered to Governor at 4:45 p.m. on April 3, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance Department, licensing of insurance producers, title insurance agents, or independent adjusters, applicants, fingerprinting for criminal background check, provisions regarding transfer to National Association of Insurance Commissioners (NAIC's) deleted, Secs. 27-7-4.4, 27-9A-17, 27-25-4.6 am'd.
Title
Insurance Department, licensing of insurance producers, title insurance agents, or independent adjusters, applicants, fingerprinting for criminal background check, provisions regarding transfer to National Association of Insurance Commissioners (NAIC's) deleted, Secs. 27-7-4.4, 27-9A-17, 27-25-4.6 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:45 p.m. on April 3, 2014. |
2014-04-03 | House | Pocket Vetoed |
2014-04-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-04-03 | House | Enrolled |
2014-04-03 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1198 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |
2014-02-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 123 |
2014-02-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance |