AL HB102 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Children First Trust Fund, appropriations from for fiscal year ending September 30, 2017, use of allocation pursuant to Section 41-15B-2.2 and this act, tobacco settlement revenues deposited in fund within 30 days of receipt, Finance Director to notify each agency of allocation, appropriations conditional on tobacco revenues, appropriation of additional tobacco settlement funds, audit, Children's Affairs Department to report to Legislature and Children's Policy Council, appropriations from General Fund to various entities contingent upon adoption of const. amend. proposed by SB147, 2012 Reg. Sess.
Title
Children First Trust Fund, appropriations from for fiscal year ending September 30, 2017, use of allocation pursuant to Section 41-15B-2.2 and this act, tobacco settlement revenues deposited in fund within 30 days of receipt, Finance Director to notify each agency of allocation, appropriations conditional on tobacco revenues, appropriation of additional tobacco settlement funds, audit, Children's Affairs Department to report to Legislature and Children's Policy Council, appropriations from General Fund to various entities contingent upon adoption of const. amend. proposed by SB147, 2012 Reg. Sess.
Sponsors
Rep. Chris Sells [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Indefinitely Postponed |
2016-02-17 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |