AL HB102 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-25 - Delivered to Governor at 2:21 p.m. on February 25, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-25 - Delivered to Governor at 2:21 p.m. on February 25, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Housing Finance Authority, mortgage guarantee fund, use of funds for, alternative housing programs authorized under Home Buyers Initiative Act, guidelines, Sec. 24-1A-44 added; Sec. 24-1A-42 am'd.
Title
Housing Finance Authority, mortgage guarantee fund, use of funds for, alternative housing programs authorized under Home Buyers Initiative Act, guidelines, Sec. 24-1A-44 added; Sec. 24-1A-42 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 68) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 68) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:21 p.m. on February 25, 2014. |
2014-02-25 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-88. |
2014-02-25 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 476 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |
2014-01-30 | House | Engrossed |
2014-01-30 | House | Cosponsors intended to be added |
2014-01-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 88 |
2014-01-30 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 87 |
2014-01-30 | House | Hill Amendment Offered |
2014-01-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance |