AL HB102 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Hurst motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Hurst motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Elections, election officers, Legislature by local law authorized to appoint alternate election officers, Sec. 17-8-1 am'd.
Title
Elections, election officers, Legislature by local law authorized to appoint alternate election officers, Sec. 17-8-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Hurst motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-03-14 | Hurst motion to Substitute a Companion Bill adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-03-14 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 344 | |
2012-03-14 | Constitution, Campaigns and Elections first Substitute Offered | |
2012-03-14 | Third Reading Indefinitely Postponed | |
2012-02-16 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections |