AL HB102 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-02 - Further Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, text messaging or operating a handheld wireless telecommunication device while operating a motor vehicle on public street, road, or highway prohibited, penalties, law enforcement agencies to report statistical information to Public Safety Department and Attorney General
Title
Motor vehicles, text messaging or operating a handheld wireless telecommunication device while operating a motor vehicle on public street, road, or highway prohibited, penalties, law enforcement agencies to report statistical information to Public Safety Department and Attorney General
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 44) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 83 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-03-31 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 83 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Further Consideration | |
2011-06-02 | Singleton motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Carried Over | |
2011-04-06 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2011-04-27 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-31 | Engrossed | |
2011-03-31 | Cosponsors Added | |
2011-03-31 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 155 | |
2011-03-31 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 154 | |
2011-03-31 | Newton (C) Amendment Offered | |
2011-03-31 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 153 | |
2011-03-31 | Public Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-09 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2011-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |