AL HB100 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Americans First Act, clarifying status of institutions of higher education as agencies of state under Beason-Hammon Alabama Taxpayer and Citizen Protection Act and required to comply with all immigration laws or be subject to forfeiture of certain funds, Sec. 31-13-5.1 added
Title
Americans First Act, clarifying status of institutions of higher education as agencies of state under Beason-Hammon Alabama Taxpayer and Citizen Protection Act and required to comply with all immigration laws or be subject to forfeiture of certain funds, Sec. 31-13-5.1 added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-14 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 51 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 42) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 69 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 72 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 69 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-14 | House | Engrossed |
2017-02-14 | House | Members intended to cosponsor |
2017-02-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 9 |
2017-02-14 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 8 |
2017-02-14 | House | Lee Amendment Offered |
2017-02-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |