AL HB100 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 4:25 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 4:25 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools in unincorporated areas of county, reduced speed school zones on roads and highways established, signs required, Transportation Department to provide signs on state highways, fines doubled, County and Municipal Reduced Speed School Zone Act
Title
Schools in unincorporated areas of county, reduced speed school zones on roads and highways established, signs required, Transportation Department to provide signs on state highways, fines doubled, County and Municipal Reduced Speed School Zone Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Canfield [R] | Rep. Paul DeMarco [R] | Rep. Dickie Drake [R] | Rep. Allen Treadaway [R] |
Rep. Jack Williams [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Delivered to Governor at 4:25 p.m. on April 22, 2010. | |
2010-04-22 | Assigned Act No. 2010-692 on 04/29/2010. | |
2010-04-22 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-04-22 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-22 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-22 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1229 | |
2010-04-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-02 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2010-01-21 | Engrossed | |
2010-01-21 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 71 | |
2010-01-21 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 70 | |
2010-01-21 | Canfield Amendment Offered | |
2010-01-21 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 69 | |
2010-01-21 | Public Safety first Substitute Offered | |
2010-01-21 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-01-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety |