AL HB10 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Delivered to Governor at 3:34 p.m. on March 29, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Taxation, commercial fishing, ad valorem tax exemption for vessels and equipment, sales and use taxes exemption for bait, levy of excise tax at a rate differential of one and one-half percent on purchase and storage of vessels and machinery used for commercial fishing, Secs. 40-9-1, 40-23-1, 40-23-4, 40-23-37, 40-23-60, 40-23-63 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation, commercial fishing, ad valorem tax exemption for vessels and equipment, sales and use taxes exemption for bait, levy of excise tax at a rate differential of one and one-half percent on purchase and storage of vessels and machinery used for commercial fishing, Secs. 40-9-1, 40-23-1, 40-23-4, 40-23-37, 40-23-60, 40-23-63 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 688 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 687 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 34 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 33 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - HBIR: Brown (C) motion to Adopt Roll Call 32 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-29HouseDelivered to Governor at 3:34 p.m. on March 29, 2022.
2022-03-29HouseAssigned Act No. 2022-199.
2022-03-29HouseClerk of the House Certification
2022-03-29SenateSignature Requested
2022-03-17HouseEnrolled
2022-03-17SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 688
2022-03-17HousePassed Second House
2022-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed
2022-02-23SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2022-02-03SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2022-02-03HouseEngrossed
2022-02-03HousePringle intended to vote "Yea"
2022-02-03HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 34
2022-02-03HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 33
2022-02-03HouseWays and Means General Fund Amendment Offered
2022-02-03HouseThird Reading Passed
2022-02-02HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2022-01-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40231Amended CodeSee Bill Text
402337Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40234Amended CodeSee Bill Text
402360Amended CodeSee Bill Text
402363Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4091Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB10&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/PrintFiles/HB10-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/PrintFiles/HB10-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/PrintFiles/HB10-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/PrintFiles/216946-3.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/FiscalNotes/FN-43442.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/FiscalNotes/FN-43513.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/FiscalNotes/FN-43862.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/FiscalNotes/FN-44489.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=672206&VOTE=32&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20HB10&SESS=1079
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=672213&VOTE=33&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1079&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=672214&VOTE=34&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1079&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=683652&VOTE=687&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20HB10&SESS=1079
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=683654&VOTE=688&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1079&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback