AL HB1 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to controlled substances; to amend Section 13A-12-231, Code of Alabama 1975; to add mandatory minimums for certain felony drug trafficking crimes; to provide for additional penalties for subsequent offenses; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.
Title
Relating to controlled substances; to amend Section 13A-12-231, Code of Alabama 1975; to add mandatory minimums for certain felony drug trafficking crimes; to provide for additional penalties for subsequent offenses; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Add Cosponsor (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Add Cosponsor (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | House | Enacted |
2023-04-06 | House | Enrolled |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-04-06 | Senate | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Judiciary |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate Judiciary |
2023-03-23 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-03-23 | House | Add Cosponsor |
2023-03-23 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-03-23 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-03-22 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported Favorably from House Judiciary |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending |
2023-01-20 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Judiciary |
2023-01-20 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |
2023-01-20 | House | Prefiled |