AL HB1 | 2015 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-16 - Delivered to Governor at 9:45 p.m. on September 16, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

General fund budget, appropriations for ordinary expenses of executive, legislative, and judicial departments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General fund budget, appropriations for ordinary expenses of executive, legislative, and judicial departments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-16 - House - Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 70 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - Senate - Orr motion to Table (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - Senate - Orr Second Substitute as Amended Motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - Senate - Dial motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - Senate - Orr motion to Table (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 59 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 47 N: 10 NV: 21 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 27 N: 31 NV: 19 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2015-09-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 49 N: 13 NV: 16 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 46 N: 29 NV: 10 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 65 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-09-11 - House - Clouse motion to Table (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 23) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-16HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:45 p.m. on September 16, 2015.
2015-09-16HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-540.
2015-09-16HouseAinsworth intended to vote "Yea"
2015-09-16HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-09-16SenateSignature Requested
2015-09-16HouseEnrolled
2015-09-16SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2015-09-16HouseClouse motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 68
2015-09-16HouseConcurrence Requested
2015-09-16SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 65
2015-09-16SenateOrr motion to Table adopted Roll Call 64
2015-09-16SenateSingleton Amendment Offered
2015-09-16SenateOrr Second Substitute as Amended Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 63
2015-09-16SenateDial motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 62
2015-09-16SenateDial Amendment Offered
2015-09-16SenateBlackwell motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2015-09-16SenateBlackwell Amendment Offered
2015-09-16SenateSanford motion to Adopt adopted Voice Vote
2015-09-16SenateSanford Amendment Offered
2015-09-16SenateOrr motion to Table adopted Roll Call 61
2015-09-16SenateHightower Amendment Offered
2015-09-16SenateOrr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2015-09-16SenateHightower Amendment Offered
2015-09-16SenateOrr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2015-09-16SenateHightower Amendment Offered
2015-09-16SenateOrr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
2015-09-16SenateHightower Amendment Offered
2015-09-16SenateOrr second Substitute Offered
2015-09-16SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 60
2015-09-16SenateHolley Amendment Offered
2015-09-16SenateOrr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 59
2015-09-16SenateOrr first Substitute Offered
2015-09-16SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-09-16SenateMarsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2015-09-16SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2015-09-14SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-09-11SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2015-09-11HouseEngrossed
2015-09-11HouseBeech, Davis and Faust intended to vote "Yea" and Shedd intended to vote "Nay"
2015-09-11HouseSouth and Ainsworth intended to vote "Yea"
2015-09-11HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 32
2015-09-11HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 31
2015-09-11HouseKnight Amendment Offered
2015-09-11HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 30
2015-09-11HouseClouse motion to Table lost Roll Call 29
2015-09-11HousePatterson Amendment Offered
2015-09-11HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 28
2015-09-11HouseJones Amendment Offered
2015-09-11HouseClouse motion to Table adopted Roll Call 27
2015-09-11HouseWarren Amendment Offered
2015-09-11HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 26
2015-09-11HouseClouse first Substitute Offered
2015-09-11HouseClouse motion to Table adopted Roll Call 25
2015-09-11HouseWays and Means General Fund Amendment Offered
2015-09-11HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-09-10HouseClouse motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2015-09-10HouseWays and Means General Fund Amendment Offered
2015-09-10HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2015-09-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2015-09-08HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on W&MGF

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB1
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2015SS/PrintFiles/HB1-int.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=530943&VOTE=25&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531023&VOTE=26&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531025&VOTE=27&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531028&VOTE=28&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531034&VOTE=29&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531035&VOTE=30&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531037&VOTE=31&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=531045&VOTE=32&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=532028&VOTE=59&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=532030&VOTE=60&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=532046&VOTE=61&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=532067&VOTE=62&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=532068&VOTE=63&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=532070&VOTE=64&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=532071&VOTE=65&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=532079&VOTE=68&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1067&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback