AL HB1 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 11:20 a.m. on April 7, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 11:20 a.m. on April 7, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Greene Co., sheriff may operate jail store, distrib. for law enforcement purposes, audit, prior actions ratified and confirmed
Title
Greene Co., sheriff may operate jail store, distrib. for law enforcement purposes, audit, prior actions ratified and confirmed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | Delivered to Governor at 11:20 a.m. on April 7, 2011 | |
2011-04-07 | Assigned Act No. 2011-135. | |
2011-04-07 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-04-07 | Signature Requested | |
2011-04-07 | Enrolled | |
2011-04-07 | Passed Second House | |
2011-04-06 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 196 | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-10 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2011-03-09 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 16 | |
2011-03-09 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |