AK SR5 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on November 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-18 - PERMANENTLY FILED 11/13 SENATE RESOLVE 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizing the 150th anniversary of the purchase of Alaska.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Purchase Of Alaska; 150th Anniversary

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-18SenatePERMANENTLY FILED 11/13 SENATE RESOLVE 5
2017-07-07Senate2:07 PM 7/5/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2017-05-03SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2017-05-03SenateBEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
2017-05-03SenateAM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
2017-05-03SenateTAKEN UP UC
2017-05-01SenateCOSPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, BISHOP, MACKINNON, MICCICHE, HUGHES, EGAN, MEYER, KELLY
2017-05-01SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback